OK HB3146 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Daylight saving time; ordering a legislative referendum pursuant to the Oklahoma Constitution; establishing standard time in this state on certain date; ballot title; filing.
Title
Daylight saving time; ordering a legislative referendum pursuant to the Oklahoma Constitution; establishing standard time in this state on certain date; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Denise Brewer [D] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Rep. Nicole Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 37 |
2022-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Brewer, Miller |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |