OK HB3936 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child sexual abuse material; changing name of certain criminal offense; effective date.
Title
Child sexual abuse material; changing name of certain criminal offense; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Provenzano |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |