OK SB1001 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Investigation of Escaped inmates; allowing certain investigations and warrants.
Title
Investigation of Escaped inmates; allowing certain investigations and warrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-26 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 21; Ayes: 60 Nays: 26 |
2016-05-26 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-26 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-05-25 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-24 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2016-04-27 | Senate | SCs named Smalley, Barrington, Brooks, David, Brecheen, Dossett, Paddack |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2016-04-18 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-14 | House | Emergency not considered |
2016-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 11 |
2016-04-14 | House | General Order |
2016-04-06 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-06 | House | Title stricken |
2016-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2016-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-16 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |