OK SB1245 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
Pending: House Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services
Pending: House Economic Development and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; requiring certain proposed agreements to be reviewed by State Bond Advisor. Emergency.
Title
Public finance; requiring certain proposed agreements to be reviewed by State Bond Advisor. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |