OK SB1268 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child pornography; modifying definition. Effective date.
Title
Child pornography; modifying definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy) |
2024-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2024-03-26 | House | Remove Representative Osburn as principal House author and substitute with Representative Provenzano |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |