OK SB1270 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Scrap Metal Dealers Act; modifying records requirement. Effective date.
Title
Scrap Metal Dealers Act; modifying records requirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-12 | House | General Order |
2016-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Peterson (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |