OK SB1330 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; creating the Oklahoma City National Memorial Education Revolving Fund; purpose. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry; creating the Oklahoma City National Memorial Education Revolving Fund; purpose. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |