OK SB1419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Handheld electronic device; specifying prohibited acts; prescribing fines; modifying definitions. Emergency.
Title
Handheld electronic device; specifying prohibited acts; prescribing fines; modifying definitions. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Loring (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dossett |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |