OK SB1641 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child Care Facilities Licensing Act; authorizing appeals of certain decisions; requiring removal from certain registry under certain circumstances; authorizing award of certain relief. Effective date.
Title
Child Care Facilities Licensing Act; authorizing appeals of certain decisions; requiring removal from certain registry under certain circumstances; authorizing award of certain relief. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-18 | House | Title stricken |
2024-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-04-08 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Withdrawn from Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2024-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |