OK SB1980 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; defining term; modifying definition. Effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; defining term; modifying definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2024-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |