OK SB297 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB297
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; acts authorized for small farm winery license. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; acts authorized for small farm winery license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12 |
2017-05-25 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-05-25 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Bice, Newberry, Leewright, Daniels, Stanislawski, Sparks, Pittman |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11 |
2017-04-19 | House | Title stricken |
2017-04-19 | House | Amended |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB297 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37A | 2 | 131 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 3 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |