OK SB43 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB43
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; notification regarding certain carry on college campus. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; notification regarding certain carry on college campus. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Jordan [R] | Sen. James Leewright [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] |
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-27 | Senate | coauthored by Gann |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Faught |
2017-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (John) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Coody |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB43 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental