OK SB448 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Commercial motor vehicles transporting empty storage container tank. Commercial drivers license. Emergency.
Title
Commercial motor vehicles transporting empty storage container tank. Commercial drivers license. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-01 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-25 | HAs read | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 6 | |
2012-04-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2012-04-24 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | Title restored | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Billy (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Emergency added | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-15 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1 | 173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 901c | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 18 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 606 | New Code | See Bill Text |