OK SB468 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB468
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Coauthored by Senator Simpson
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Coauthored by Senator Simpson
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; prohibiting a health insurer from modifying coverage of prescription drug in certain circumstances; providing for civil penalty. Effective date.
Title
Health insurance; prohibiting a health insurer from modifying coverage of prescription drug in certain circumstances; providing for civil penalty. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB468 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Coauthored by Senator Simpson