OK SB609 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB609
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation; Local Development Act; project plans; incentives; exemptions; manufacturing ad valorem exemption; modifying definition of manufacturing facilities; removing exceptions for failure to meet certain payroll requirements. Effective date.
Title
Taxation; Local Development Act; project plans; incentives; exemptions; manufacturing ad valorem exemption; modifying definition of manufacturing facilities; removing exceptions for failure to meet certain payroll requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Sen. Julia Kirt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6 |
2021-05-25 | House | CCR adopted |
2021-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2021-05-18 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2021-05-06 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2021-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2021-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 5 |
2021-04-21 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Kirt |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Coleman |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB609 (Carry Over) 2021-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021