OK SB744 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB744
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Ambulance Service Provider Access Payment Program; providing calculation and payment methodology for certain services; allowing certain substitution of requirements. Emergency.
Title
Ambulance Service Provider Access Payment Program; providing calculation and payment methodology for certain services; allowing certain substitution of requirements. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Carry Over) 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee