OK SB949 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Income tax refund, donation to Sports Eye Safety Program Revolving Fund or Historic Greenwood District Music Festival Revolving Fund.
Title
Income tax refund, donation to Sports Eye Safety Program Revolving Fund or Historic Greenwood District Music Festival Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Jonathan Nichols [R] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] |
Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | To Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 | |
2011-05-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shumate, Scott | |
2011-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | CCR read | |
2011-05-18 | SCs named Nichols, Myers, Mazzei, Jolley, Burrage, Sparks | |
2011-05-18 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2011-05-16 | Conference granted, naming GCCA | |
2011-05-16 | SCs named GCCA | |
2011-05-13 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-26 | HAs read | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | Title restored | |
2011-04-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Nichols | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 2368 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |