OR HB2046 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 205, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 205, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurer to provide specified notice to insured or prospective insured enrolled in short term health insurance policy. Requires insurer to provide specified notice to insured or prospective insured enrolled in short term health insurance policy. Prohibits insurer from establishing due date for payment of first individual health benefit plan premium earlier than 15 days after coverage begins or after date invoice is sent, whichever is later. Authorizes Department of Consumer and Business Services to access, use and disclose data in all payer all claims database for carrying out department's duties, subject to conditions. Requires grace period of at least 30 days for payment of premium for individual health benefit plan. Requires notice of adverse benefit determination to be provided in culturally and linguistically appropriate manner and specifies elements that must be included in notice. Adds new provisions applicable to external review by independent review organization. Requires insurer to send notice of nonpayment of premium at least 15 days prior to end of grace period established for individual health benefit plans. Removes or modifies certain references to federal law in laws concerning health insurance.
Title
Relating to health insurance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 205, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Findley, Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Wallan; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |