OR HB2094 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 55, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 55, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to define "veteran" by rule for Oregon Housing Fund programs. Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to define "veteran" by rule for Oregon Housing Fund programs. Allows department director to delegate signing of housing bonds. Clarifies definition and qualification criteria of "qualified housing sponsor."
Title
Relating to housing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 55, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard, Robinson. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Noble, Power. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |