OR HB2100 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 720, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 5, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-05 - Chapter 720, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 5, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to functions of the Oregon Health Authority; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to functions of the Oregon Health Authority; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | Chapter 720, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 5, 2011. | |
2011-08-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-29 | President signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 44; Excused, 1--Hoyle; Excused for Business of the House, 15--Beyer, Buckley, Cowan, Freeman, Garrard, Hicks, Komp, Kotek, McLane, Nathanson, Nolan, Richardson, Smith G., Thatcher, Whisnant. | |
2011-06-24 | Third reading. Carried by Kruse, Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Atkinson, Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-06-21 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-20 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-06-17 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-16 | Third reading. Carried by Freeman,Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-06-15 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-14 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred. Ayes, 32; Nays, 27--Bailey, Barnhart, Berger, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Cannon, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Komp, Kotek, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Smith J., Tomei, Witt, Speaker Roblan; Excused, 1--Frederick. | |
2011-05-24 | Third reading. Carried by Thompson. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-19 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-26 | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-26 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | |
2011-04-20 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-11 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |