OR HB2109 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 60, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 60, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "renewable energy facility" for purposes of county permitting process for certain energy facilities. Modifies definition of "renewable energy facility" for purposes of county permitting process for certain energy facilities. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to county land use permits to establish renewable energy facilities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 60, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 4--Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Post; Absent, 1--Breese-Iverson; Excused, 3--Morgan, Stark, Zika. |
2021-03-22 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G. |
2021-03-16 | House | Carried over to March 22, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |