OR HB2166 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 518, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 518, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Early Childhood Suspension and Expulsion Prevention Program. Establishes Early Childhood Suspension and Expulsion Prevention Program. Directs Early Learning Division to administer program. Requires persons certified or registered by Office of Child Care to comply with provisions of program. Directs State Board of Education to adopt social emotional learning standards and statewide social emotional framework. Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group for purposes of adopting standards and framework. Expands State Board of Education rulemaking authority to include authority to adopt rules for public kindergartens and public elementary and secondary schools consistent with goal of increasing educator diversity. Authorizes Teacher Standards and Practices Commission to approve certain educator preparation programs that are nontraditional pathway to licensure. Expands types of entities that may sponsor or provide approved educator preparation programs. Increases amount of scholarships awarded by Higher Education Coordinating Commission to culturally and linguistically diverse teacher candidates. Modifies requirements related to parties and contents of intergovernmental agreement establishing Educator Advancement Council. Prescribes council membership requirements. Authorizes Department of Education to award grants from Statewide Education Initiatives Account to certain eligible public charter schools. Prescribes requirements related to application and use of grants. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to education equity; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 518, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. Referred to Rules by order of the President. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-15 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |