OR HB2214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 675, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 675, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs public university to report annually to Attorney General on university's use of outside counsel for legal matters. Limits amount that may be paid to outside attorneys hired by state government.] Directs public university to report annually to Attorney General on university's use of outside counsel for legal matters. Directs Attorney General to report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on use of outside counsel by universities no later than July 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the Attorney General; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 675, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Nays, 4--Bynum, Drazan, Hayden, Zika; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 1--Smith Warner; Excused, 7--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Leif, Smith G, Speaker Kotek, Wallan. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |