OR HB2231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 62, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 62, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain types of voluntary service in uniformed service from five-year limit on eligibility for reemployment rights in private and public sectors. Exempts certain types of voluntary service in uniformed service from five-year limit on eligibility for reemployment rights in private and public sectors. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to reemployment rights for servicemembers; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Shelly Boshart Davis [R] | Rep. Christine Drazan [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Bill Post [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 62, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Burdick, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Lively, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Carried over to March 24, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Carried over to March 22, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |