OR HB2387 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes refundable credit against personal income taxes for contributions to higher education savings network account or ABLE account. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2026. Eliminates subtraction for contribution to ABLE account or higher education savings network account. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the Oregon 529 Savings Network; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2019-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |