OR HB2411 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 647, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 647, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updates terms for teacher education programs and institutions. Streamlines licensure structure for teachers and administrators. Increases maximum amount allowed for fees for issuance of license. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to the Teacher Standards and Practices Commission; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | House | Chapter 647, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 6, 2015. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 34; Nays, 25--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Evans, Fagan, Gilliam, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 32; Nays, 25--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Evans, Fagan, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Barker, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2015-06-09 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-02 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-12 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Education by order of Speaker. |
2015-02-17 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education. |
2015-02-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |