OR HB2415 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 223, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 223, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to adopt rules to establish minimum standards and statewide consistency in electronic processes for reviewing plans, issuing permits and performing field inspections. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to conduct study to evaluate feasibility of and develop standards and specifications for system that allows for performing electronic field inspections and construction progress inspections and to verify compliance with building code requirements on site] adopt rules to establish minimum standards and statewide consistency in electronic processes for reviewing plans, issuing permits and performing field inspections. Requires municipalities that administer and enforce building inspection programs to use department's electronic system for access to building codes information or to use system that is equivalent to and compatible with] department's system. Requires municipalities that administer and enforce building inspection programs to meet minimum standards department adopts regardless of whether municipality uses equivalent system. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to electronic access to building codes information; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 223, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Drazan, Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Marsh. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |