OR HB2433 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Chapter 13, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Chapter 13, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that electronically filed criminal citation may be of different format or size than uniform citation. Authorizes law enforcement officers to electronically file violation citations and authorizes court to allow electronically filed violation citations. Provides that electronically filed violation citation may be of different format or size than uniform citation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to electronic filing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Chapter 13, (2015 Laws): Effective date March 18, 2015. |
2015-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Olsen; excused, 2--Girod, Thomsen. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-02-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Kennemer. |
2015-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |