OR HB2513 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 294, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 294, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires police officers to be trained in airway and circulatory anatomy and physiology and certified in cardiopulmonary resuscitation. Requires police officers to be trained in airway and circulatory anatomy and physiology and certified in cardiopulmonary resuscitation. Requires peace officer to request emergency medical services within 60 seconds] immediately after encountering restrained person suffering respiratory or cardiac compromise in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 294, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Boquist, Findley, Heard, Robinson; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Taylor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-20 Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Equitable Policing. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |