OR HB2537 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 227, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 227, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts to use moneys distributed from Student Investment Account for payment of student fees, costs and instructors of career and technical student organization programs. Allows school districts to use moneys distributed from Student Investment Account for payment of student fees, costs and instructors of career and technical student organization programs. Establishes policy goal that students in career and technical education program have counselor or mentor assigned to student to assist student in navigating through program.].
Title
Relating to career and technical education structural support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 227, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 2--Salinas, Smith Warner; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan. |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |