OR HB2594 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 737, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 737, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In commitment proceedings instituted against person alleged to have mental illness, offers court option of ordering "assisted outpatient treatment" for up to 12 months, during which period person is released from custody but court retains jurisdiction while person participates in outpatient treatment if recommended by community mental health program director.
Title
Relating to commitment of persons with mental illness; and appropriating money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 737, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Krieger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barnhart, Buckley. |
2013-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |