OR HB2667 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 741, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 741, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Task Force on Procuring Through Small and Local Businesses.
Title
Relating to public procurement; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 741, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 14, 2014. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 5--George, Hass, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Devlin. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Cameron, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, Weidner; Excused, 2--Barker, Smith. |
2013-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |