OR HB2724 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 659, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 659, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Housing and Community Services Department to develop and implement Rent Guarantee Program to provide incentives and financial assistance to landlords that rent or lease to low income households by guaranteeing payments to landlords for unpaid rent and for eviction and property damage costs within certain limits. Authorizes department to request proposals from and contract with program providers to administer program. Requires collection of performance outcome measures and annual report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly on housing. Establishes Rent Guarantee Program Fund and continuously appropriates moneys to department for Rent Guarantee Program.
Title
Relating to the Rent Guarantee Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 659, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Nearman. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |