OR HB2875 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 461, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 461, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain employee of State Fire Marshal qualifies as firefighter for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to study public employee retirement and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022.] Provides that certain employee of State Fire Marshal qualifies as firefighter for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Modifies dates on which Public Employees Retirement Board must initiate, resume or reduce payment of certain increased benefits under Public Employees Retirement System because benefit payments are or are not subject to Oregon personal income tax. Provides for restoration of certain retirement credit forfeited at end of 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public employee retirement; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] |
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 461, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Thomsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Wilde. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-02 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |