OR HB2928 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 728, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 728, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Class Sizes to determine appropriate class sizes of students, identify methods to reduce class sizes and determine cost for methods to reduce class sizes. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to task force on class sizes; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 728, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Edwards. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-07-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed.Ayes, 42; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Heard, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson. |
2015-06-30 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |