OR HB2955 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 731, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 731, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to administer process for providing funding for activities related to annual conference dedicated to Oregon civics and held on Oregon Civics Day for Teachers. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for purpose of conference.] Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to Oregon Civics Day for Teachers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 731, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Post; Excused, 3--Gallegos, Hack, Weidner. |
2015-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |