OR HB2980 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset date of pesticide use reporting system. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to pesticide use reporting; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |