OR HB2981 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 385, (2013 Laws): 90 days after Sine Die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 385, (2013 Laws): 90 days after Sine Die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows exception to employment requirements for rural renewable energy development zone exemption from property taxation if provided for in resolution of zone sponsor and business firm makes certain minimum investment in qualified property.
Title
Relating to rural renewable energy development zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | Chapter 385, (2013 Laws): 90 days after Sine Die. |
2013-06-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Freeman, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Fagan. |
2013-05-14 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |