OR HB3086 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-01 - Chapter 710, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-01 - Chapter 710, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows State Department of Fish and Wildlife, after consultation with specified parties, to develop and administer uniform policy for mitigating adverse effects that proposed actions may have on core area habitat of sage grouse.
Title
Relating to sage grouse; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-01 | House | Chapter 710, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013. |
2013-08-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Baertschiger, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Krieger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barnhart, Buckley. |
2013-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-07-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |