OR HB3145 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes legislative findings regarding merits of state agency administration and enforcement of state building code for capital construction projects receiving state-supplied funding.
Title
Relating to application of the state building code to capital construction projects; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-22 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |