OR HB3188 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 650, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 650, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes landowners who meet certain criteria to petition for formation of predator damage control district within county. Establishes petition filing and hearing requirements. Modifies definition of "predatory animals" to include bears, bobcats and red foxes. Requires county commissioners to appoint advisory board that shall submit annual report and make recommendations about activities in district to commissioners.] for newly formed predator damage control district. Establishes presumptive charges of $1 per acre for tax lots of 10 or more acres and $25 flat rate charge for tax lots of less than 10 acres for purpose of paying actual cost to county of preventing, reducing and mitigating damage to property from predatory animals within district. Requires advisory board to consider annually whether presumptive charges are sufficient and to recommend charges to county. Requires county to consider recommended charges and authorizes county to amend recommended charges and to further increase or reduce charges to reflect deficit or excess from previous years. Establishes presumption that owner of certain land within district has elected to incur charge and authorizes owner to elect not to incur charge. Authorizes owners of all other land within district to elect to incur charge. Requires board to submit to county list of landowners electing to incur charges. Requires county to certify list and amount of charges to county assessor. Provides that charges are to be collected and accounted for in same manner as county taxes. Provides that county may not provide services to prevent, reduce or mitigate damage from predatory animals to property within predator damage control district if owner elects not to incur charge or if charge remains delinquent. Requires permanent tax rate on lands in predator damage control district to be expressed as per acre rate and on dollars per thousand dollars of assessed value basis, not to exceed $1 per acre.] Sunsets January 2, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a principal Act for predator control districts; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. (Printed B-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Finance and Revenue. (Printed B-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | House | Chapter 650, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Buckley, Holvey, Nearman; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Gelser; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by McKeown, Heard. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Holvey, Nearman; Excused, 2--Boone, Nathanson. |
2015-04-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 30, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |