OR HB3304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 652, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 652, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows applicant for licensing as landscape construction professional, or for issuance of limited or specialty license, to take practical skills test and attend class on landscape contracting business practices as alternative to taking written examination. Allows applicant for licensing as landscape construction professional, or for issuance of limited or specialty license, to take practical skills test and attend class on landscape contracting business practices as alternative to taking written examination. Provides guidelines for carrying out of practical skills test and business practices class. Provides that fees paid by applicants taking practical skills test be set in amount sufficient to fully offset cost of practical skills testing and business practices class. Allows State Landscape Contractors Board to subcontract or otherwise arrange for third party carrying out of practical skills testing or business practices class. Requires board to make practical skills testing and business practices class available no later than May] September 1, 2016. Requires board to report to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2016] May 15, 2017, regarding implementation of practical skills test and business practices class. Requires board to make written examination for licensing as landscape construction professional or backflow assembly installer available upon applicant request in format having instructions and questions in English followed by Spanish translation. Applies to examinations offered on or after January] May 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to licenses issued by the State Landscape Contractors Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | House | Chapter 652, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 28; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2015-06-16 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-04 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-14 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |