OR HB3307 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 375, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 375, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that intergovernmental entity may seek to obtain any benefits from any public or private entity that any unit of local government or American Indian tribe that is party to intergovernmental agreement may seek to obtain. Clarifies that intergovernmental entity may seek to obtain any benefits from any public or private entity that any unit of local government or American Indian tribe that is party to intergovernmental agreement may seek to obtain. Requires benefits sought to be used for purposes for which intergovernmental entity was created. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to intergovernmental agreements; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 375, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |