OR HB3375 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 376, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 376, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes goal of planning for development of up to three gigawatts of floating offshore wind energy projects within federal waters off Oregon Coast by 2030. Establishes goal of planning for development of up to three gigawatts of commercial scale] floating offshore wind energy projects within federal waters off Oregon Coast by 2030. Establishes policy position of State of Oregon related to offshore energy research and development in federal waters off Oregon Coast. Establishes Task Force on Floating Offshore Wind Energy. Requires task force to develop floating offshore wind development strategic plan and to submit plan to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to energy no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets December 31, 2022.] Directs State Department of Energy to conduct literature review on benefits and challenges of integrating up to three gigawatts of floating offshore wind energy into Oregon's electric grid by 2030. Directs department to submit report on findings to appropriate interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to floating offshore wind energy; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 376, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 8--Boquist, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Riley, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Smith G. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |