OR HB3511 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Computer Science, Invention, Technology and Engineering Revitalization Grant Program within Department of Education. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to the Computer Science, Invention, Technology and Engineering Revitalization Grant Program; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Komp [D] | Rep. John Davis [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-03-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3511 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3511/Introduced |