OR HB4005 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 53, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 53, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases number of enterprise zones that may be designated for electronic commerce. Establishes income tax credit for manufacturing facility if taxpayer makes capital investment. Provides for certification by Oregon Business Development Department. Authorizes department to certify business firms on or after July 1, 2014, and on or before December 31, 2017. Limits amount of credits allowed per biennium. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax expenditures; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 53, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--George, Shields. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-20 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith. |
2014-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Davis, Matthews. |
2014-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |