OR HB4009 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Chapter 2, (2012 Laws): Effective date February 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Chapter 2, (2012 Laws): Effective date February 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the impaired health professional program; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the impaired health professional program; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Chapter 2, (2012 Laws): Effective date February 27, 2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-21 | President signed. | |
2012-02-21 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-17 | Carried over to 02-20 by unanimous consent. | |
2012-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-16 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2012-02-10 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-09 | Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Lindsay. | |
2012-02-08 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-07 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-03 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |