OR HB4013 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 55, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 55, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes practitioners to electronically transmit prescriptions for Schedule II controlled substances in nonemergency situations. Requires specified entities that reimburse cost of prescription drugs to make easily accessible to prescribing practitioners information about step therapy protocols required by entities for prescription drug coverage. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to prescriptions; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Jim Thompson [R] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 55, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Thompson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barton, Kennemer. |
2014-02-05 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |