OR HB4020 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 27, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 27, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Act makes all people who apply to be a notary public take a course before taking the required test. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.6). Requires an applicant for a commission as a notary public to complete a course of study offered by the Secretary of State before taking the required examination, even if the applicant already holds a commission in Oregon.
Title
Relating to notaries public.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 27, (2024 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2025. |
2024-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 9--Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Cate, Evans, Yunker; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Lively. |
2024-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2024-02-15 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass, rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means, and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2024-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |