OR HB4049 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act directs OSU to study PFAS in biosolids that are spread on farm fields that do not produce crops for human food. The Act directs OSU to submit a final report by Sept. 1, 2027. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.0). [Digest: This Act directs OSU to study the fate of PFAS in biosolids that are spread on farm fields. The Act directs OSU to submit a report by Dec. 15, 2025. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.7).] Directs the Oregon State University Extension Service and the College of Agricultural Sciences of Oregon State University to study the [fate and transport] distribution and occurrence of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) found in biosolids applied to agricultural fields that do not produce crops intended for human consumption. Directs the extension service and college to submit [findings] a final report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to agriculture not later than [December 15, 2025] September 1, 2027. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to a study of PFAS in biosolids applied to land; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |